Accounts and annual returns CANSA FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1105352
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 27 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 18 February 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 26 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 21 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 25 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required