Accounts and annual returns MAKING A DIFFERENCE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107286
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 01 March 2011 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 08 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 08 August 2008 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 25 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required