Financial history THE STEADFAST TRUST

Charity number: 1105806
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £8.77k £8.73k £8.68k £9.52k £8.55k
Total expenditure £9.88k £8.02k £10.86k £7.60k £6.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A