Accounts and annual returns APEL CANSER AIL GYFLE SECOND CHANCE CANCER APPEAL

Charity number: 1107239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 14 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 March 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 March 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required