Accounts and annual returns CHUN YEN ZEN

Charity number: 1106168
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2008 30 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 29 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 20 February 2006 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required