Accounts and annual returns IMPACT CHRISTIAN CENTRE INTERNATIONAL
Charity Number: 1105646
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 138 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 24 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 24 January 2019 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window