Accounts and annual returns MWAMANGA VILLAGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 1107161
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 August 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 09 July 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 January 2023 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 March 2022 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required