Accounts and annual returns RINGBANG FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1105667
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 16 February 2010 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 16 February 2010 16 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 February 2010 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required