Financial history JAIN VISHVA BHARATI LONDON

Charity number: 1106357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.39k £160.45k £107.71k £130.50k £164.28k
Total expenditure £66.50k £60.62k £90.46k £127.69k £124.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A