Financial history FRIENDS OF ENGLISH MARTYRS

Charity Number: 1105802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £11.13k £5.21k £5.86k £9.21k £3.90k
Total expenditure £8.84k £9.37k £1.66k £12.75k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A