Financial history NOTTINGHAM, MANDARIN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity Number: 1105981
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014
Total gross income £3.24k £2.20k £1.68k £3.04k £4.08k
Total expenditure £2.56k £2.71k £2.94k £3.46k £3.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A