Financial history ALLENDALE SPORTS CLUB

Charity number: 1107484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.55k £26.43k £16.74k £15.57k £10.04k
Total expenditure £21.03k £9.02k £13.97k £18.57k £10.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.94k £22.37k £8.00k £6.00k N/A