Financial history THE FRIENDS OF CHELMSFORD MUSEUMS

Charity Number: 1106243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £3.48k £1.90k £2.19k £3.07k £2.71k
Total expenditure £1.58k £1.19k £996 £1.86k £2.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A