Financial history SPEAKUP SELF ADVOCACY LIMITED

Charity number: 1109054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £419.14k £574.56k £495.93k £468.52k £901.00k
Total expenditure £440.21k £414.18k £492.94k £520.79k £588.99k
Income from government contracts £141.70k £73.62k £140.15k N/A £369.43k
Income from government grants £136.56k £97.10k £68.47k £54.16k £106.66k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £2.57k N/A N/A £825
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £558.65k N/A N/A £867.82k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £10 N/A N/A £427
Income - Other N/A £13.33k N/A N/A £31.92k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £414.18k N/A N/A £588.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.98k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0