Governing document NOTTINGHAM TWINS & TRIPLETS CLUB

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2015 AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2023
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE PUBLIC) REGARDING THE PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND FINANCIAL ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH MULTIPLE BIRTHS, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND RAISING AWARENESS. B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF FAMILIES WITH MULTIPLE BIRTH CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AREA AT ALL STAGES OF THEIR CHILDREN'S DEVELOPMENT (BEFORE AND AFTER THEIR BABIES ARE BORN, THROUGH CHILDHOOD AND EVEN UP UNTIL THEY ARE TEENAGERS AND ADULTS) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING BY BY: · PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LOCAL FAMILIES WITH MULTIPLES TO MEET UP, WHICH PROMOTES A SENSE OF COMMUNITY AND A NETWORK OF PEER-SUPPORT · HOSTING A SOCIAL MEDIA GROUP FOR COMMUNICATION BETWEEN LOCAL FAMILIES WITH MULTIPLES · SUPPORTING DAYTIME PLAYGROUPS FOR FAMILIES WITH MULTIPLES IN VARIOUS AREAS OF NOTTINGHAM · LIAISING WITH LOCAL MATERNITY HOSPITALS · PROVIDING A 1:1 PEER-SUPPORT “BUDDY” FOR FAMILIES WITH YOUNG MULTIPLES
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.