Financial history JIMINY CRICKET'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1106154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £67.79k £77.35k £86.69k £88.77k £110.80k
Total expenditure £69.00k £78.17k £76.09k £86.66k £117.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A