Accounts and annual returns SPARKY AND HEIDI BELOVED PETS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1108150
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 15 June 2007 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required