Financial history Parents and Teachers of the Hartford Schools

Charity Number: 1106470
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £3.84k £3.49k £2.61k £2.64k £3.64k
Total expenditure £2.91k £2.85k £2.77k £2.82k £1.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A