Accounts and annual returns THE CHILDREN'S FORTUNE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106380
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 21 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 10 September 2008 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 15 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 15 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2005 21 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 21 June 2006 On Time