Financial history THE SAMANTHA JONES TRUST

Charity number: 1107443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £20.14k £4.43k £565 £99 £241
Total expenditure £11.03k £8.85k £2.86k £2.68k £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A