Financial history FURZEFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1106469
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £43.66k £17.25k £22.09k £44.09k £46.66k
Total expenditure £40.92k £39.85k £7.96k £45.17k £44.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A