Accounts and annual returns WESLEY HALL (CROOKES) CHILDREN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1106654
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2007 05 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 05 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2006 07 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 07 September 2006 On Time