Financial history NEW GENERATION IMPACT UK

Charity number: 1107487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.09k £1.30k £7.02k £4.47k £4.47k
Total expenditure £15.36k £500 £6.23k £4.10k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A