Trustees FIRST BRIGHSTONE SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1106474
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLE TRUMAN | Chair | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Anderson | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Anne Watson | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
AVICE MARINER | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS POCOCK | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Medland | Trustee | 20 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JENNINGS | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR B THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS J SMART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.