Financial history COOKING FOR LIFE

Charity number: 1110965
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £13.60k £8.95k £9.74k £13.20k £3.64k
Total expenditure £13.60k £8.95k £9.74k £13.20k £3.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A