Accounts and annual returns HOPE FOR SOUTH AFRICA'S CHILDREN

Charity number: 1106844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 July 2023 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window