Financial history ECCLESBOURNE VALLEY RAILWAY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £370.45k £230.80k £103.90k £99.47k £151.79k
Total expenditure £114.25k £81.86k £123.27k £133.06k £179.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.00k £8.00k N/A N/A