Accounts and annual returns THE AREA 4 ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1107436
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 March 2018 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 04 April 2017 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required