Financial history KASENA/NANKANA DEVELOPMENT LEAGUE UK ("KNDL UK")

Charity Number: 1107867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.62k £7.39k £4.72k £4.72k £4.70k
Total expenditure £2.70k £2.50k £0 £0 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A