Trustees FRIENDS OF TOLWORTH SCHOOL (F.O.T.S)

Charity number: 1106926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natasha Torres Chair 20 October 2019
None on record
Ruth Marsh Trustee 21 October 2023
None on record
Stacey Richard Trustee 18 March 2022
TOLWORTH ST GEORGE'S CHURCH
Recently registered
Raza Ali Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Tessa Staniforth Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Katharine Dallas Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record
Yu-Mei Li Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Vian Al-Gailani Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record
Rachel Nye Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Rachel Jennings Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record