Financial history THE ISLE OF WIGHT MILITARY HISTORY MUSEUM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1109071
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2008 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011 31/05/2012
Total gross income £1.45k £26 £3.04k £49.62k £62.93k
Total expenditure £1.45k £0 £6.77k £27.13k £36.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A