Accounts and annual returns BREAST HEALTH INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1109838
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 25 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 25 September 2015 On Time