Accounts and annual returns CHALFONT ST GILES YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1107243
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 March 2024 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 March 2024 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2022 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2021 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required