Financial history CAROLINA TRUST

Charity number: 1109143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £471.42k £160.54k £347.44k £769.49k £999.32k
Total expenditure £433.56k £160.87k £310.06k £816.74k £1.14m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.02k £3.45k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £62.36k £18.27k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £703.01k £41.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £4.12k £940.06k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £816.74k £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.14m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0