Accounts and annual returns POVERTY FIGHTERS INTERNATIONAL MOVEMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 1108190
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 December 2009 21 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 15 December 2008 12 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 15 December 2007 12 October 2009 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 15 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 15 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 15 October 2005 10 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2005 Not Required