Financial history EYNSFORD MILLFIELD TRUST

Charity Number: 1109181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £673 £0 £684 £1.42k £652
Total expenditure £254 £715 £385 £220 £835
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A