Accounts and annual returns REALITY (UK) INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1108584
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2007 29 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 29 September 2008 On Time