Trustees GUST Independent School Ltd

Charity number: 1108544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Derek Leathard Chair 18 November 2024
None on record
MARGARET LEWIS Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
Criag Ducat Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
PAUL HEDLEY Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
Michelle Eugenie Henderson Trustee 11 January 2024
None on record
Susanne Miller Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Brian Beadle Trustee 28 March 2016
None on record