Financial history THE STRONG FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1107533
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016
Total gross income £0 £5.21k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £970 £1.05k £1.85k £1.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0