Financial history FRIENDS OF MERIDIAN SCHOOL, GREENWICH

Charity number: 1108587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.16k £12.07k £8.37k £11.28k £11.30k
Total expenditure £25.45k £12.27k £6.08k £3.04k £499
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A