Accounts and annual returns BILDESTON SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1107556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required