Accounts and annual returns THE NORTH WALSHAM SKATE PARK PROJECT
Charity Number: 1108015
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2007 | 12 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2007 | 21 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 17 September 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 17 September 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window