Financial history NEWDITCH PLANTATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1107652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63 £25 £4 £30 £138
Total expenditure £527 £467 £329 £1.59k £21
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A