Accounts and annual returns OVERSEAL PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity number: 1107771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 27 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required