Financial history KIDD LEGACY BEING A PART OF CENTRAL PARK, DARTFORD

Charity number: 1134257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.94k £292 £3.08k £13.05k £21.84k
Total expenditure £5.44k £5.27k £5.57k £5.57k £5.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A