Accounts and annual returns FREE PLAY NETWORK

Charity number: 1108205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2024 323 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 December 2024 688 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2024 1053 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 December 2024 1418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required