Accounts and annual returns WORD AND DEED

Charity Number: 1109325
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 September 2022 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 14 October 2020 76 days late