Accounts and annual returns BIASAN HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1109245
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2010 04 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2009 10 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 06 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2007 29 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required