Trustees ANGLO ASIAN FRIENDSHIP SOCIETY
Charity number: 1108891

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GURPAUL SINGH SAGOO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sunil chand | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seyed Fard | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shankar Vedhara | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raluca Ionescu | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gheorghe Bahica | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
jamie thirunavukkarasu | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ASGHAR ALI | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUKASZ HAWRO | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
FOLUSO C FASUAN | Trustee | 22 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVINDER SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JASWANT SINGH DHALIWAL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.