Financial history HEELANDS RANGERS FC

Charity number: 1108688
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/06/2019 06/06/2020 06/06/2021 06/06/2022 06/06/2023
Total gross income £17.87k £16.63k £24.46k £25.42k £24.47k
Total expenditure £21.00k £18.10k £21.67k £18.97k £24.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £800 £854 N/A N/A N/A